Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Paris

Archidioecesis Parisiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Michel Christian Alain Aupetit, Archbishop
  • Denis Jean-Marie Jachiet, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Thibault Verny, Auxiliary Bishop
  • André Armand Vingt-Trois, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 October 1622
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 105 (40 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Ile-de-France
  • Official Web Site: https://www.paris.catholique.fr/
  • Mailing Address: 10 rue du Cloitre-Notre-Dame, 75004 Paris, France
  • Telephone: 1.78.91.91.91

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Paris
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Paris (erected)
Archdiocese of Paris
20 October 1622ElevatedDiocese of Paris Archdiocese of Paris
29 November 1801Territory LostArchdiocese of Paris Diocese of Versailles (erected)
9 October 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Paris
Diocese of Versailles
Diocese of Créteil (erected)
Diocese of Nanterre (erected)
Diocese of Saint-Denis (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Paris
19501,591,9034,775,71133.3%1,5035842,0877628329,500222ap1951
19702,090,0002,590,77180.7%8671,8332,7007742,1834,139100ap1971
19801,829,0002,330,00078.5%8791,1001,97992451,2453,53498ap1981
19901,781,0002,271,00078.4%6169381,5541,146411,2562,855113ap1991
19991,540,0002,228,00069.1%6848161,5001,026821,0162,822120ap2000
20001,377,0002,116,00065.1%6678631,530900811,3802,805126ap2001
20011,357,0002,116,00064.1%6227741,396972841,3242,642126ap2002
20021,270,0002,116,00060.0%5947981,392912901,3472,516126ap2003
20031,270,0002,116,00060.0%5767631,339948951,3402,486126ap2004
20041,548,9962,212,85170.0%5667301,2961,195941,2522,500116ap2005
20131,346,3002,243,83360.0%8375501,3879701141,0101,745114ap2014
20161,358,6042,265,88660.0%6005411,1411,1901041,0141,710113ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Paris
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.5, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast