Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Habert de Montmort

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹Born
2 May 162227.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cahors, France
2 May 162227.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
29 Mar 162732.2SucceededBishop of Cahors, France
2 May 162732.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
27 Feb 163641.1DiedBishop of Cahors, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Habert de Montmort
Bishop Pierre Habert de Montmort (born 1595, died ) Bishop of Cahors

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 142, and Page 315
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast