Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André du Saussay

Deceased

Bishop of Toul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589¹BornParis
164960.0SelectedBishop of Toul, France
11 Oct 165566.7ConfirmedBishop of Toul, France
16 Jul 165667.5Ordained BishopBishop of Toul, France
9 Sep 167586.6DiedBishop of Toul, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André du Saussay:
Bishop André du Saussay (born 1589, died ) Bishop of Toul

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 350
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015