Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Étienne Moreau

Deceased

Bishop of Arras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹BornParis
28 Apr 166866.3SelectedBishop of Arras, France
3 Sep 166866.6ConfirmedBishop of Arras, France
21 Oct 166866.8Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
8 Jan 167068.0DiedBishop of Arras, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Étienne Moreau:
Bishop Étienne Moreau (died ) Bishop of Arras

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015