Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolaus Choart de Buzenval

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1611BornParis
3 Oct 165039.1AppointedBishop of Beauvais, France
8 Jan 165139.4Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais, France
21 Jul 167967.9DiedBishop of Beauvais, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Choart de Buzenval:
Bishop Nicolaus Choart de Buzenval (born , died ) Bishop of Beauvais

  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015