Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François de La Cropte de Bourzac

Deceased

Bishop of Noyon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1696Born
28 Aug 173337.0SelectedBishop of Noyon, France
27 Sep 173337.1ConfirmedBishop of Noyon, France
7 Nov 173438.2Ordained BishopBishop of Noyon, France
23 Jan 176669.4DiedBishop of Noyon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François de La Cropte de Bourzac
Bishop Jean-François de La Cropte de Bourzac (born , died ) Bishop of Noyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 315

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast