Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Marie Pierre Touvet

Bishop of Châlons, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1965 Born
28 Jun 199227.1Ordained PriestPriest of Dijon, France
23 Dec 201550.6AppointedBishop of Châlons, France
28 Feb 201650.7Ordained BishopBishop of Châlons, France

MicroData Summary for François Marie Pierre Touvet
Bishop François Marie Pierre Touvet (born ) Bishop of Châlons

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Châlons.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 23 Dec 2015
  • od/c0: CB, 13 Jan 2016
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jan 2016
  • mn: CB, 8 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,853

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast