Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Simon de Champigny

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Oct 1492AppointedBishop of Paris, France
22 Sep 1493Ordained BishopBishop of Paris, France
23 Dec 1502DiedBishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Simon de Champigny
Bishop Jean Simon de Champigny (died ) Bishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSens, Archdiocese of Sens
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 213
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,493, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast