Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Bochart de Saron de Champigny

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633¹BornParis
18 May 168754.3SelectedBishop of Clermont, France
10 Mar 169259.1ConfirmedBishop of Clermont, France
31 Aug 169259.6Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
11 Aug 171582.6DiedBishop of Clermont, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Bochart de Saron de Champigny:
Bishop François Bochart de Saron de Champigny (born 1633, died ) Bishop of Clermont

  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015