Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Dubois, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of New York, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1764BornParis, France
28 Sep 178723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
23 May 182661.7AppointedBishop of New York, New York, USA
29 Oct 182662.2Ordained BishopBishop of New York, New York, USA
20 Dec 184278.3DiedBishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Dubois:
Bishop John Dubois P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop of New York

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013