Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Yves André Michel Nahmias

Bishop of Meaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1957 Born
24 Jun 198931.7Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
1 Jun 200648.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
1 Jun 200648.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Termae Himerae
8 Sep 200648.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Termae Himerae
9 Aug 201254.8AppointedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Yves André Michel Nahmias (VIAF: 8964768)
Bishop Jean-Yves André Michel Nahmias (born ) Bishop of Meaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Mandé, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Meaux.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,237
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Aug 2012
  • loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 9 Jul 2018

Quantcast