Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre-André-Charles Cardinal Petit de Julleville

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Aquiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1876Born
4 Jul 190326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
23 Jun 192750.5AppointedBishop of Dijon, France
29 Sep 192750.8Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
10 Oct 192750.8InstalledBishop of Dijon, France
7 Aug 193659.7AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
18 Sep 193659.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Dijon, France
15 May 193760.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Dijon, France
18 Feb 194669.2Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194669.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Aquiro
10 Dec 194771.0DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-André-Charles Petit de Julleville (VIAF: 9917837)
Pierre-André-Charles Cardinal Petit de Julleville (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDijon

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
  • a cardinal for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast