Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ernest Costa de Beauregard

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Dijon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1868Born
Jun 1896³28.3Ordained PriestPriest of Chambéry, France
May 191547.2AppointedBishop of Dijon, France
14 Jun 191547.3ResignedBishop-Elect of Dijon, France
7 Feb 195486.0DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Dijon, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Ernest Costa de Beauregard
Father Ernest Costa de Beauregard (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Dijon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 57.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast