Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène Jacques Philippe Crépin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paris, France

Titular Bishop of Tralles in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1861Born
19 Dec 188524.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
18 Dec 188625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
9 Apr 192664.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
9 Apr 192664.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tralles in Asia
25 May 192664.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tralles in Asia
1 Apr 194280.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Eugène Jacques Philippe Crépin (VIAF: 73846770)
Bishop Eugène Jacques Philippe Crépin (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDieppe, Archdiocese of Rouen
Ordained DeaconSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Villemomble, Diocese of Saint-Denis

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 34
  • loc: AJ, 8 Nov 2017
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast