Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Augustin Le Pileur

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saintes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1650¹BornParis
4 Apr 171161.2SelectedBishop of Saintes, France
19 Oct 171161.7ConfirmedBishop of Saintes, France
21 Dec 171161.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saintes, France
19 Dec 171565.9ResignedBishop of Saintes, France
25 Apr 172676.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Saintes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri-Augustin Le Pileur:
Bishop Henri-Augustin Le Pileur (born 1650, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saintes

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015