Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel François Pollien

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris, France

Titular Bishop of Pulcheriopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1937Born
30 Oct 196528.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
25 Jun 196628.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
12 Jul 199658.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
12 Jul 199658.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pulcheriopolis
11 Oct 199659.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pulcheriopolis
31 Aug 201275.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
15 Jan 201375.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Michel François Pollien
Bishop Michel François Pollien (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,856
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Aug 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 15 Jan 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jul 2018

Quantcast