Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Tuboeuf

Deceased

Bishop of Castres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹BornParis
20 Jun 165351.4SelectedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
26 Jan 165452.0ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
12 Apr 165452.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
29 Jun 166462.4SelectedBishop of Castres, France
6 Oct 166462.7ConfirmedBishop of Castres, France
16 Apr 168280.2DiedBishop of Castres, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Tuboeuf:
Bishop Michel Tuboeuf (died ) Bishop of Castres

  • a bishop for 28.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 140, and Page 284
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015