Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Perrochel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1602BornParis
9 Jun 164340.6SelectedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
6 Feb 164542.3ConfirmedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
11 Jun 164542.6Ordained BishopBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
8 Feb 167774.3ResignedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
8 Apr 168279.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for François Perrochel:
Bishop François Perrochel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)

  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015