Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philibert de Brichanteau

Deceased

Bishop of Laon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1588Born
19 Apr 162132.7AppointedBishop of Laon, France
21 Dec 165264.4DiedBishop of Laon, France

MicroData Summary for Philibert de Brichanteau
Bishop Philibert de Brichanteau (born , died ) Bishop of Laon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 216
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast