Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicolas Cardinal de Pellève

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Archbishop of Sens

Prefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1518Born
24 Aug 155233.8AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
16 Dec 156244.1AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
18 May 156445.5ResignedBishop of Amiens, France
17 May 157051.5Elevated to Cardinal
4 Jul 157253.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
22 Aug 158364.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
14 Nov 158466.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
10 May 159172.5AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
4 Oct 159172.9InstalledArchbishop of Reims, France
28 Mar 159475.4DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas de Pellève (VIAF: 7543468)
Nicolas Cardinal de Pellève (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJouy-sous-Thelle, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Celestines, Church, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims

  • a cardinal for 23.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 298, and Page 106
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1552, Number 20*
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 16 Nov 2017