Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philippe Herbert (d’Ossonvilliers)

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Feb 1484AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
13 Feb 1485InstalledArchbishop of Aix, France
14 Oct 1499DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe Herbert (d’Ossonvilliers)
Archbishop Philippe Herbert (d’Ossonvilliers) (died ) Archbishop of Aix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 91
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,484, Number 19*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast