Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Poncet de la Rivière

Deceased

Bishop of Angers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1671BornParis
1696²24.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 170634.9AppointedBishop of Angers, France
1 Aug 170635.1Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
2 Aug 173059.1DiedBishop of Angers, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Poncet de la Rivière:
Bishop Michel Poncet de la Rivière (born , died ) Bishop of Angers

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 84, and Page 400
  • b/c2+: CB, 21 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013