Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Charles de Ségur

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1695Born
30 May 172226.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Oct 172327.8SelectedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
26 Jun 172428.4ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
24 Aug 172428.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
26 Feb 173539.1ResignedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
29 Sep 174852.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Charles de Ségur
Bishop Jean-Charles de Ségur (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast