Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislas Courbe

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

Titular Bishop of Castoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1886BornFribourg, Switzerland
3 Apr 191528.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 194356.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
22 Jun 194356.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
17 Aug 194356.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
Dec 1970³84.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
22 Apr 197184.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanislas Courbe:
Bishop Stanislas Courbe (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013