Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Balthasar Grangier de Liverdis

Deceased

Bishop of Tréguier, France


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Feb 1646SelectedBishop of Tréguier, France
16 Jul 1646ConfirmedBishop of Tréguier, France
18 Nov 1646Ordained BishopBishop of Tréguier, France
2 Feb 1679DiedBishop of Tréguier, France

MicroData Summary for Balthasar Grangier de Liverdis
Bishop Balthasar Grangier de Liverdis (died ) Bishop of Tréguier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast