Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maurice-Louis-Marie Rivière

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1859BornParis
8 Apr 188222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
1 Jun 191556.0AppointedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
21 Sep 191556.3Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
9 Jul 192061.1AppointedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
28 Sep 193071.3DiedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

MicroData Summary for Maurice-Louis-Marie Rivière:
Archbishop Maurice-Louis-Marie Rivière (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 62
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013