Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre Milon

Deceased

Bishop of Valence


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1688BornParis
22 Sep 171426.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 172537.3AppointedBishop of Valence, France
20 Feb 172637.7ConfirmedBishop of Valence, France
31 Mar 172637.8Ordained BishopBishop of Valence, France
18 Nov 177183.4DiedBishop of Valence, France

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Milon:
Bishop Alexandre Milon (born , died ) Bishop of Valence

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 403
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015