Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges Edmond Robert Gilson

Archbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1929 Born
29 Jun 195627.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
20 Apr 195727.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
13 Jul 197647.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
13 Jul 197647.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
9 Oct 197647.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benda
13 Aug 198152.2AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
2 Aug 199667.1AppointedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
2 Aug 199667.1AppointedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
31 Dec 200475.5RetiredArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
31 Dec 200475.5RetiredPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France

MicroData Summary for Georges Edmond Robert Gilson (VIAF: 49226120)
Archbishop Georges Edmond Robert Gilson (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • od/op/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 9 Jul 2018

Quantcast