Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Vialart de Saint-Paul, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Avranches, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹Born
18 May 164048.3SelectedBishop of Avranches, France
26 May 164250.4ConfirmedBishop of Avranches, France
6 Jul 164250.5Ordained BishopBishop of Avranches, France
15 Sep 164452.7DiedBishop of Avranches, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Vialart de Saint-Paul (VIAF: 7665266)
Bishop Charles Vialart de Saint-Paul O.S.B. (born 1592, died ) Bishop of Avranches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast