Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flavien-Abel-Antoinin Hugonin

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1823Born
25 May 185026.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 186643.0SelectedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
22 Feb 186743.6ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
1 May 186743.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
2 May 189874.8DiedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France

MicroData Summary for Flavien-Abel-Antoinin Hugonin (VIAF: 73904588)
Bishop Flavien-Abel-Antoinin Hugonin (born , died ) Bishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThodure
Ordained BishopSte Genevieve, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 138
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Jun 2017