Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Meulan

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Oct 1334AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
2 Apr 1335Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
3 Jan 1351AppointedBishop of Noyon, France
8 Feb 1352AppointedBishop of Paris, France
22 May 1363DiedBishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Meulan
Bishop Jean de Meulan (died ) Bishop of Paris

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,267
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 334, and Page 373
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast