Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustache Le Clerc de Lesseville

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1614¹BornParis
13 Sep 165844.6SelectedBishop of Coutances, France
13 Jan 165945.0ConfirmedBishop of Coutances, France
23 Mar 165945.2Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
8 Dec 166551.9DiedBishop of Coutances, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eustache Le Clerc de Lesseville:
Bishop Eustache Le Clerc de Lesseville (died ) Bishop of Coutances

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015