Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles de Saint-Albin

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1698BornParis
20 Sep 172123.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 172123.5SelectedBishop of Laon, France
14 Jan 172223.8ConfirmedBishop of Laon, France
26 Apr 172224.1Ordained BishopBishop of Laon, France
17 Oct 172325.5SelectedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
20 Dec 172325.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
9 May 176466.1DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Saint-Albin:
Archbishop Charles de Saint-Albin (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014