Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis-Antoine Cardinal de Noailles

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1651BornCros-de-Montvert
8 Jun 167524.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 167927.7SelectedBishop of Cahors, France
8 May 167927.9ConfirmedBishop of Cahors, France
18 Jun 167928.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
21 Jun 168029.1SelectedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
17 Mar 168129.8ConfirmedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
19 Aug 169544.2SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
19 Sep 169544.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
21 Jun 170049.1Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jan 170149.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
3 Mar 172977.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
4 May 172977.9DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Antoine de Noailles:
Cardinal Louis-Antoine de Noailles (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 49.9 years
  • a cardinal for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013