Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Philippe de Chaumont Quitry

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acqs (Dax)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹BornParis
14 Dec 167151.9AppointedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
1 May 167252.3Ordained BishopBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
1684²64.0ResignedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
24 Mar 169777.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Acqs (Dax), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul-Philippe de Chaumont Quitry:
Bishop Paul-Philippe de Chaumont Quitry (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Acqs (Dax)

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 93
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 12 Apr 2015