Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Marie Pidou de Saint-Olon, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Baghdad, Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1637Born
24 Nov 168750.2AppointedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
9 May 169456.6Ordained BishopBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
20 Nov 171780.1DiedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie Pidou de Saint-Olon
Bishop Louis-Marie Pidou de Saint-Olon C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Baghdad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 110
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast