Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gabriel Auguste François Cardinal Marty

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Paris

Cardinal-Priest of San Luigi dei Francesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1904BornPachins
28 Jun 193026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rodez (-Vabres), France
6 Feb 195247.7AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
1 May 195247.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
14 Dec 195955.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Reims, France
14 Dec 195955.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hemesa
9 May 196055.9SucceededArchbishop of Reims, France
22 Feb 196560.7AppointedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
26 Mar 196863.8AppointedArchbishop of Paris, France
29 Mar 196863.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of France, Faithful of Eastern Rites
15 Jul 196864.1ResignedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
28 Apr 196964.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 196964.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Luigi dei Francesi
6 May 197570.9AppointedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
25 Nov 197571.5ResignedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
31 Jan 198176.7RetiredArchbishop of Paris, France
31 Jan 198176.7RetiredVicar Apostolic of France, Faithful of Eastern Rites
16 Feb 199489.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Auguste François Marty:
Gabriel Auguste François Cardinal Marty (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
  • a cardinal for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015