Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre Camus

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belley


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1584BornParis
160823.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 160924.6AppointedBishop of Belley, France
30 Aug 160924.8Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
162843.2ResignedBishop of Belley, France
165166.2SelectedBishop of Arras, France
26 Apr 165267.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Belley, France

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Camus:
Bishop Jean-Pierre Camus (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belley

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 100, and Page 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013