Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Gourguillon

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Reims, France

Titular Bishop of Suas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1928Born
17 Dec 195527.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 199163.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
19 Nov 199163.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Suas
26 Jan 199263.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suas
21 Jan 200374.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
23 Nov 200779.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for François Gourguillon
Bishop François Gourguillon (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,655
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast