Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alain Paul Charles Lebeaupin

Apostolic Nuncio to European Union

Titular Archbishop of Vico Equense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1945 Born
28 Jun 197530.3Ordained PriestPriest of Nice, France
7 Dec 199853.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vico Equense
7 Dec 199853.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ecuador
6 Jan 199953.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Vico Equense
14 Jan 200559.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kenya
14 Jan 200559.8AppointedPermanent Observer to United Nations Environment Program and Human Settlements Program
23 Jun 201267.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to European Union

MicroData Summary for Alain Paul Charles Lebeaupin
Archbishop Alain Paul Charles Lebeaupin (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of European Union

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, France

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to European Union.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,456
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 May 2017