Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Auguste-Marie-Joseph Forbin-Janson

Deceased

Bishop of Nancy (-Toul), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1785Born
19 Dec 181126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chambéry, France
26 Nov 182338.2SelectedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
3 May 182438.6ConfirmedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
6 Jun 182438.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
11 Jul 182438.8InstalledBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
11 Jul 184458.8DiedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Auguste-Marie-Joseph Forbin-Janson
(VIAF: 72173502; WikiData: Q2960575)
Bishop Charles-Auguste-Marie-Joseph Forbin-Janson (born , died ) Bishop of Nancy (-Toul)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestChambéry
Ordained BishopChapelle du Mont-Valérien, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceFamily, Château, near Marseilles, Diocese of Marseille
Buried Place (Original)Picpus, Cemetery, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 31
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 258, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 262, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 376, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 470, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,089, Ascendance
  • b: Dictionnaire Biographique des Évèques Catholiques du Canada, Page 512, to Page 514

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 12 Dec 2022