Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Vialart de Herse

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1613Born
26 May 164228.7AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
6 Jul 164228.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
11 Jun 168066.7DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France

MicroData Summary for Félix Vialart de Herse (VIAF: 14777936)
Bishop Félix Vialart de Herse (born , died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 141
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast