Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Cupif

Deceased

Bishop of Dol


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1607¹BornParis
16 Jan 164033.0AppointedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
25 Mar 164033.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
13 Nov 165245.8AppointedBishop of Dol, France
21 Sep 165952.7DiedBishop of Dol, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Cupif (VIAF: 88731883)
Bishop Robert Cupif (born 1607, died ) Bishop of Dol

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 219, and Page 175
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Jun 2016