Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alphonse-Martin Larue

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Langres

Titular Archbishop of Pelusium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1825BornParis
2 Jun 184924.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 188459.3SelectedBishop of Langres, France
13 Nov 188459.7ConfirmedBishop of Langres, France
21 Dec 188459.8Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
Aug 1899³74.4ResignedBishop of Langres, France
14 Dec 189974.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pelusium
1 May 190378.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Langres, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alphonse-Martin Larue:
Archbishop Alphonse-Martin Larue (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Langres

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 345, and Page 445

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013