Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Baltasar Phélypeaux d’Herbault

Deceased

Bishop of Riez


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Nov 1713AppointedBishop of Riez, France
31 Dec 1713Ordained BishopBishop of Riez, France
31 Aug 1751DiedBishop of Riez, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Baltasar Phélypeaux d’Herbault:
Bishop Louis-Baltasar Phélypeaux d’Herbault (died ) Bishop of Riez

  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 331
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015