Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luc Marie Daniel Ravel, C.R.S.V.

Archbishop of Strasbourg, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1957 Born
19 Dec 198225.5ProfessedMember of Canons Regular of the Congregation of Saint Victor
7 Dec 198528.5Solemn ProfessedMember of Canons Regular of the Congregation of Saint Victor
25 Jun 198831.0Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of Saint Victor
7 Oct 200952.3AppointedBishop of France, Military
29 Nov 200952.5Ordained BishopBishop of France, Military
18 Feb 201759.7AppointedArchbishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Luc Marie Daniel Ravel (VIAF: 299659444)
Archbishop Luc Marie Daniel Ravel C.R.S.V. (born ) Archbishop of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Strasbourg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,321
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Feb 2017