Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Henri Cardinal de Gondi

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1572¹Born
2 Nov 159624.8SelectedBishop of Paris, France
16 Jun 159725.4ConfirmedBishop of Paris, France
1 Mar 159826.1Ordained BishopBishop of Paris, France
26 Mar 161846.2Elevated to Cardinal
14 Aug 162250.6DiedBishop of Paris, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri de Gondi (VIAF: 22134642)
Henri Cardinal de Gondi (born 1572, died ) Bishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre Dame, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Notre Dame des Sept Douleurs Chapel, Cathedral, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 24.4 years
  • a cardinal for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Mar 1618
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast