Catholic-Hierarchy DC

André Armand Cardinal Vingt-Trois

Archbishop Emeritus of Paris, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Luigi dei Francesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1942 Born
27 Oct 196825.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
28 Jun 196926.6Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
25 Jun 198845.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
25 Jun 198845.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibilis
14 Oct 198845.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibilis
21 Apr 199956.4AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
16 May 199956.5InstalledArchbishop of Tours, France
11 Feb 200562.2AppointedArchbishop of Paris, France
5 Mar 200562.3InstalledArchbishop of Paris, France
14 Mar 200562.3AppointedOrdinary of France, Faithful of Eastern Rites
24 Nov 200765.0Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200765.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Luigi dei Francesi
27 Apr 200865.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Luigi dei Francesi
7 Dec 201775.0RetiredArchbishop of Paris, France
8 Jan 2018³75.1ResignedOrdinary of France, Faithful of Eastern Rites

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André Armand Vingt-Trois (VIAF: 32004208)
André Armand Cardinal Vingt-Trois (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSt-Etienne du Mont, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Paris.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,820
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2017
  • r?: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2018
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jul 2018

Quantcast