Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François-Armand-Auguste Cardinal de Rohan-Soubise-Ventadour

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1717BornParis
23 Dec 174124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
21 May 174224.5SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
30 Jul 174224.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
30 Jul 174224.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
4 Nov 174224.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
10 Apr 174729.4Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jul 174931.6SucceededBishop of Strasbourg, France
28 Jun 175638.6DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for François-Armand-Auguste de Rohan-Soubise-Ventadour:
Cardinal François-Armand-Auguste de Rohan-Soubise-Ventadour (born , died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

  • a priest for 14.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
  • a cardinal for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 99, and Page 349
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Apr 1747

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013