Ordained Priest | Years | Name | Current Title |
8 Mar 2023 |
| Abbot Antonio Luca Fallica, O.S.B. | Abbot of Montecassino, Italy |
26 Jan 2013 |
| Father Carl Leonard Reid | Ordinary Emeritus of Our Lady of the Southern Cross, Australia |
4 Nov 2012 |
| Bishop Andriy Khimyak | Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
30 Jun 2012 |
| Bishop Emmanuel Michel François Tois | Auxiliary Bishop of Paris, France |
15 Jun 2012 |
| Monsignor Harry Entwistle | Ordinary Emeritus of Our Lady of the Southern Cross, Australia |
27 Aug 2011 |
| Bishop Eloy Ricardo Domínguez Martínez | Auxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba |
30 Jul 2011 |
| Father Anthony Onyemuche Ekpo | Under Secretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development, Roman Curia |
16 Jul 2011 |
| Bishop Erik Varden, O.C.S.O. | Prelate of Trondheim, Norway |
29 Jun 2011 |
| Archbishop Younan (Benedict Qusay Mubarak Abdullah) Hano | Archbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq |
15 Jan 2011 |
| Monsignor Keith Newton | Ordinary of Our Lady of Walsingham, England, Great Britain |
26 Jun 2010 |
| Bishop Antuan Ilgit, S.J. | Auxiliary Bishop of Anatolia, Turkey |
21 Nov 2009 |
| Bishop Bernardo Andrés Álvarez Tapia | Auxiliary Bishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile |
22 Aug 2009 |
| Father Elia Eskandr Abd Elmalak, O.F.M. | Priest of Order of Friars Minor |
6 Aug 2009 |
| Father Fabián Alberto Belay | Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Rosario, Argentina |
30 Apr 2009 |
| Archbishop Atanasius Firas Mundher Dardar | Patriarchal Exarch of Bassorah e Golfo (Syrian), Iraq |
18 Apr 2009 |
| Bishop Strahil Veselinov Kavalenov | Bishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria |
18 Apr 2009 |
| Bishop Luis Eduardo González Cedrés | Bishop of Mercedes, Uruguay |
21 Feb 2009 |
| Monsignor Jeffrey Neil Steenson | Ordinary Emeritus of The Chair of Saint Peter, USA |
16 Aug 2008 |
| Bishop Khalid Rehmat, O.F.M. Cap. | Vicar Apostolic of Quetta, Pakistan |
26 Jul 2008 |
| Bishop Toussaint Ngoma Foumanet, C.S.Sp. | Bishop of Dolisie, Congo |
26 Jul 2008 |
| Bishop Edinson Edgardo Farfán Córdova, O.S.A. | Prelate of Chuquibambilla, Peru |
25 Jul 2008 |
| Bishop Paul Thabet Habib Yousif Al Mekko | Bishop of Alquoch (Chaldean), Iraq |
19 Jul 2008 |
| Bishop Yohane Suzgo Nyirenda | Auxiliary Bishop of Mzuzu, Malawi |
12 Jul 2008 |
| Bishop Severin Nziengui Mangandza, C.S.Sp. | Vicar Apostolic of Makokou, Gabon |
14 Jun 2008 |
| Bishop Juan Rafael Esposito-Garcia | Auxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA |
31 May 2008 |
| Bishop Brian Alan Nunes | Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA |
11 May 2008 |
| Bishop Cristian Dumitru Crişan | Auxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania |
8 May 2008 |
| Bishop Basilio Mamani Quispe | Auxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia |
27 Apr 2008 |
| Bishop Robert Saeed Jarjis | Bishop of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean), Canada |
12 Apr 2008 |
| Bishop Saulius Bužauskas | Auxiliary Bishop of Kaunas, Lithuania |
22 Dec 2007 |
| Father Cristiano Guilherme Borro Barbosa | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Boston, Massachusetts, USA |
18 Nov 2007 |
| Bishop Nobert Tamba Sandouno | Bishop of Guéckédou, Guinea |
26 Aug 2007 |
| Bishop Petro Loza, C.SS.R. | Auxiliary Bishop of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
4 Aug 2007 |
| Bishop Maksym Ryabukha, S.D.B. | Auxiliary Bishop of Donets’k (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
27 Jun 2007 |
| Bishop Ángel Maximiliano Ordoñez Sigcho | Auxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador |
9 Jun 2007 |
| Bishop Isaac Jules Peter Georges Boutros | Curial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon |
26 May 2007 |
| Bishop Roy Edward Campbell, Jr. | Auxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA |
19 May 2007 |
| Father Keith James Chylinski | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA |
17 May 2007 |
| Father Mykola Matwijiwskij (Matwijiwskyj) | Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian) |
12 May 2007 |
| Bishop Ivan Philip Camilleri | Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada |
5 May 2007 |
| Bishop Andrés Luis García Jasso | Auxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District |
25 Apr 2007 |
| Bishop Antony Prince Panengaden | Bishop of Adilabad (Syro-Malabar), India |
30 Dec 2006 |
| Bishop Andrew Souksavath Nouane Asa | Vicar Apostolic of Paksé, Laos |
8 Dec 2006 |
| Bishop Leandro Maria Alves | Bishop of Baucau, Timor-Leste |
13 Aug 2006 |
| Bishop Léonard Ndjadi Ndjate, M.C.C.I. | Auxiliary Bishop of Kisangani, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
29 Jul 2006 |
| Bishop Edgardo Fabián Antúnez-Percíncula Kaenel, S.J. | Bishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay |
22 Jul 2006 |
| Bishop Bernard de Clairvaux Toha Wontacien, O.S.F.S. | Bishop of Djougou, Benin |
2 Jul 2006 |
| Bishop Simon Chibuga Masondole | Bishop of Bunda, Tanzania |
30 Jun 2006 |
| Bishop Stepan Sus | Curial Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
24 Jun 2006 |
| Bishop Yaacoub Camil Afram Antoine Semaan | Patriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Palestine and Jordan) (Syrian), Palestine |
23 Jun 2006 |
| Bishop Fernando Ortega Ortega | Auxiliary Bishop of Cuenca, Ecuador |
17 Jun 2006 |
| Father Peter Sakmár | Apostolic Administrator of Atyrau, Kazakhstan |
17 Jun 2006 |
| Father Giordano Piccinotti, S.D.B. | President of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See, Roman Curia |
27 May 2006 |
| Father Davide Carraro, P.I.M.E. | Bishop-Elect of Oran, Algeria |
20 May 2006 |
| Father Christopher R. Cooke | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA |
14 May 2006 |
| Bishop Christian Würtz | Auxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany |
20 Apr 2006 |
| Bishop Aloysius Fondong Abangalo | Bishop of Mamfe, Cameroon |
25 Mar 2006 |
| Bishop Federico Guillermo Wechsung | Auxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina |
3 Mar 2006 |
| Bishop Ricardo Basilio Morales Galindo, O. de M. | Bishop of Copiapó, Chile |
25 Feb 2006 |
| Bishop Henry Juma Odonya | Bishop of Kitale, Kenya |
14 Feb 2006 |
| Bishop Đaminh Hoăng Minh Tiến | Bishop of Hưng Hóa, Viet Nam |
17 Jan 2006 |
| Bishop Paul Sundu | Bishop of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea |
26 Nov 2005 |
| Bishop Samuel Mbairabé Tibingar | Bishop of Koumra, Chad |
22 Oct 2005 |
| Bishop Valentine Kalumba, O.M.I. | Bishop of Livingstone, Zambia |
7 Aug 2005 |
| Bishop Lizardo Estrada Herrera, O.S.A. | Auxiliary Bishop of Cuzco, Peru |
7 Aug 2005 |
| Bishop Jean Michaël Durhône | Bishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius |
31 Jul 2005 |
| Father Léonard Kakudji Muzinga | Bishop-Elect of Kamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
16 Jul 2005 |
| Bishop Rami Flaviano Al-Kabalan | Apostolic Visitor (Visitator) |
2 Jul 2005 |
| Bishop Roko Glasnović | Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia |
1 Jul 2005 |
| Father Jack Youssef, C.M. | Priest of Congregation of the Mission |
26 Jun 2005 |
| Bishop Loïc Philippe Lagadec | Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France |
29 May 2005 |
| Bishop Mykola Semenyshyn | Auxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanislaviv] (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
28 May 2005 |
| Bishop Michael John Izen | Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA |
15 May 2005 |
| Bishop Stephen Nyodho Ador Majwok | Bishop of Malakal, South Sudan |
11 May 2005 |
| Bishop Justin Ain Soongie | Auxiliary Bishop of Wabag, Papua New Guinea |
8 May 2005 |
| Bishop Ivan Kulyk | Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
3 May 2005 |
| Bishop Mykola Bychok, C.SS.R. | Bishop of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian), Australia |
5 Apr 2005 |
| Father Reynante Alongonan Aguanta | Priest of Taytay, Philippines |
19 Mar 2005 |
| Bishop Tulio Omar Pérez Rivera | Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala |
8 Jan 2005 |
| Bishop Dominique Tinoudji | Bishop of Pala, Chad |
29 Dec 2004 |
| Bishop Hani Nassif Wasef Bakhoum Kiroulos | Curial Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt |
8 Dec 2004 |
| Bishop Giovani Edgar Arana | Bishop of El Alto, Bolivia |
6 Nov 2004 |
| Archbishop Giorgio Ferretti | Archbishop of Foggia-Bovino, Italy |
1 Nov 2004 |
| Bishop Bertrand Guy Richard Appora-Ngalanibé, O.P. | Bishop of Bambari, Central African Republic |
24 Oct 2004 |
| Bishop Emmanuel Bernardino Lowi Napeta | Bishop of Torit, South Sudan |
22 Oct 2004 |
| Father Augusto Zampini | Secretary Emeritus of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development, Roman Curia |
3 Oct 2004 |
| Bishop Matthew Remijio Adam Gbitiku, M.C.C.I. | Bishop of Wau, South Sudan |
25 Sep 2004 |
| Bishop Andrea Ripa | Secretary of the Apostolic Signatura, Roman Curia |
4 Sep 2004 |
| Bishop Christian Carlassare, M.C.C.I. | Bishop of Rumbek, South Sudan |
15 Aug 2004 |
| Bishop Pascal David Youri Chane-Teng | Bishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion |
29 Jun 2004 |
| Father Simone Renna | Under Secretary of the Dicastery for the Clergy, Roman Curia |
27 Jun 2004 |
| Bishop Philippe Guiougou | Bishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles |
27 Jun 2004 |
| Bishop Yves Henri Marcel Marie Baumgarten | Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France |
26 Jun 2004 |
| Bishop Oleksandr Yazlovetskiy | Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine |
25 Jun 2004 |
| Father Francisco Javier Martínez Castillo | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Puebla de los Ángeles, México |
19 Jun 2004 |
| Bishop Pedro Luis Fuentes Valencia, C.P. | Auxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia |
17 Jun 2004 |
| Bishop Eusebius Jelous Nyathi | Bishop of Gokwe, Zimbabwe |
12 Jun 2004 |
| Father Andrea Lembo, P.I.M.E. | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Tōkyō, Japan |
12 Jun 2004 |
| Bishop Peter Adrian Chifukwa | Bishop of Dedza, Malawi |
9 Jun 2004 |
| Father Ariel Galido, M.S.C. | Prefect of Marshall Islands, Pacific (Oceania) |